EP0457141 - Reactive dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunde, Klaus, Dr. Moltkestrasse 5 W-5206 Neunkirchen 1 / DE | 02 /
Henk, Hermann, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 55 W-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 03 /
Schündehütte, Karl-Heinz, Prof. Dr. Klief 75 W-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Stöhr, Frank-Michael, Dr. Am Thelen Siefen 10 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 91107257.7 | 04.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19904016058 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016058 | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457141 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457141 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/255, D06P1/382 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
C09B62/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/47] | Title | German: | Reaktivfarbstoffe | [1991/47] | English: | Reactive dyes | [1991/47] | French: | Colorants réactifs | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1570565 ; | [A]DE3835725 ; | [A]GB1009471 ; | [A]FR1275623 |