EP0460408 - Hydraulic vehicle brake installation with antilock system and traction control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kollers, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Fuchsweg 3 W-7148 Remseck 2 / DE | 02 /
Wolff, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Schulberg 20 W-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | 03 /
Käs, Günter Markelsheimer Strasse 70 W-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 91107261.9 | 04.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | DE19904017872 | 02.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4017872 | [1991/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460408 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/48 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
B60T8/4059 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
B60T8/4881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Fahrzeugbremsanlage mit Antiblockiersystem und Antriebsschlupfregelung | [1991/50] | English: | Hydraulic vehicle brake installation with antilock system and traction control | [1991/50] | French: | Installation hydraulique de freinage pour véhicule avec système anti-blocage et contrôle de traction | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3900852 ; | [A]DE3900850 ; | [A]EP0324103 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2218480 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4568131 (BLOMBERG FOLKE I [SE], et al) |