EP0463333 - Thermoplastic film having a surface pattern and method for its fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagens, Hajo, Dr. Guldenweg 12 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1992/01] | Application number, filing date | 91107468.0 | 08.05.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | DE19904015658 | 16.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015658 | [1992/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0463333 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0463333 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463333 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04, B29C55/26 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
B29C55/12 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,US);
B29D7/01 (EP,US);
F16C11/103 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0072 (EP,US);
B31F2201/072 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0056 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0064 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0085 (EP,US);
Y10S264/902 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/01] | Title | German: | Oberflächenstrukturierte Folie aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1992/01] | English: | Thermoplastic film having a surface pattern and method for its fabrication | [1992/01] | French: | Feuille thermoplastique avec une surface structurée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63278940 ; | [A]DE1504720 (DU PONT); | [X]US3842152 (WITFIELD H, et al); | [A]GB2104847 (CLOPAY CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0230633 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [X]EP0242165 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 105 (C-575)(3453) 13. März 1989 & JP-A-63 278 940 ( TORAY INDUSTRIES INC. ) 16. November 1988, & JP63278940 A 00000000 |