EP0456226 - Dye forming coupler and silver halide color photographic material containing the same and method for forming color image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Yasuhiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Koushin, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Makoto, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ishii, Yoshio, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Tsukahara, Jiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107518.2 | 08.05.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | JP19900121670 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: JP 12167090 | JP19910103593 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: JP 10359391 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456226 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456226 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, C07D487/04, // (C07D487/04, 231:00, 209:00) | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C7/30529 (EP,US);
G03C7/3825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/46] | Title | German: | Farbstoffbildender Kuppler und farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial, das diesen enthält und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Farbbildes | [1991/46] | English: | Dye forming coupler and silver halide color photographic material containing the same and method for forming color image | [1991/46] | French: | Coupleur formateur de colorant et matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent le contenant et méthode pour former une image colorée | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.09.1994 | FR | 07.09.1994 | IT | 07.09.1994 | LI | 07.09.1994 | NL | 07.09.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
FR | 07.09.1994 | ||
IT | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
IT | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
FR | 03.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
FR | 03.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/16] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - no relevant documents have been disclosed |