EP0465795 - Door check [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1992 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DICTATOR TECHNIK DR. WOLFRAM SCHNEIDER & CO. VERWALTUNGS + BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSCHAFT Gutenbergstrasse, 9 W-8902 Neusäss / DE | [1992/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stech, Joachim Waldbrunnen 3 W-8851 Thierhaupten / DE | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b D-86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107595.0 | 10.05.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19900010360U | 09.07.1990 Original published format: DE 9010360 U | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465795 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/02, E05F3/12 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
E05F5/027 (EP);
E05F3/12 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/256 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1992/03] | Title | German: | Türfänger | [1992/03] | English: | Door check | [1992/03] | French: | Ferme-porte | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1901664 ; | [A]GB1157965 ; | [A]GB1348887 ; | [A]DE1708435 ; | [A]DE1130325 |