EP0457252 - Tamper-proof sprayer for liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/47] | Sprayer for liquids having guarantees against possible tampering | ||
[1994/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPRAY PLAST S.p.A. Via Monte Verena, 46 I-36022 San Zeno di Cassola (Vicenza) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states SPRAY PLAST S.p.A. Via Monte Verena, 46 I-36022 San Zeno di Cassola (Vicenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buti, Sario Via Pergolesi, 24 IT-San Giacomo di Romano d'Ezzelino (VI) / IT | [1994/48] |
Former [1991/47] | 01 /
Buti, Sario Via Pergolesi, 24 San Giacomo di Romano d'Ezzelino, V(VI) / IT | Representative(s) | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91107743.6 | 14.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | IT19900021183U | 15.05.1990 Original published format: IT 2118390 U | [1991/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457252 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457252 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
B05B11/0005 (EP);
B05B11/1045 (EP);
B05B11/0032 (EP);
B05B11/1057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Originalitätsgesicherte Sprühvorrichtung | [1994/48] | English: | Tamper-proof sprayer for liquids | [1994/48] | French: | Vaporisateur inviolable | [1991/47] |
Former [1991/47] | Originalitätgesicherte Sprühvorrichtung | ||
Former [1991/47] | Sprayer for liquids having guarantees against possible tampering | Examination procedure | 09.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2081938 (AFA CORP); | [A]FR2382274 (TADA TETSUYA [JP]); | [Y]EP0105000 (ETHYL PROD [US]); | [A]DE8903592U |