EP0459243 - Substituted Azines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drewes, Mark Wilhelm, Dr. Grünstrasse 30 W-4018 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Kirsten, Rolf, Dr. Carl-Langhans-Strasse 27 W-4019 Monheim / DE | 03 /
Krämer, Wolfgang, Dr. Rosenkranz 25 W-5093 Burscheid 2 / DE | 04 /
Krüger, Bernd-Wieland, Dr. Unterboschbach 19 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 05 /
Santel, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Grünstrasse 9a W-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
Lürssen, Klaus, Dr. August-Kierspel-Strasse 145 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 07 /
Schmidt, Robert R., Dr. Im Waldwinkel 110 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 91108010.9 | 17.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19904017339 | 30.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017339 | DE19904037003 | 21.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4037003 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0459243 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0459243 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/38, C07D239/34, C07D251/20, A01N43/54, A01N43/66 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/66 (EP,US);
C07D239/60 (EP,US);
C07D251/30 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/49] | Title | German: | Substituierte Azine | [1991/49] | English: | Substituted Azines | [1991/49] | French: | Azines substituées | [1991/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0334137 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0346789 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0350691 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0363040 (SCHERING AGROCHEMICALS LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0363818 (BASF AG [DE]) |