EP0458265 - Flexible, planar patch electrode for cardiac defibrillation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1991/48] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lekholm, Anders, Dr. Gneisvägen 4 S-161 39 Bromma / SE | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91108187.5 | 21.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | US19900527622 | 23.05.1990 Original published format: US 527622 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458265 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458265 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/0587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Flexible, flächige Kissenelektrode zur Herz-Entflimmerung | [1991/48] | English: | Flexible, planar patch electrode for cardiac defibrillation | [1991/48] | French: | Electrode plane et flexible pour la défibrillation cardiaque | [1991/48] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0095727 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]); | [YD]US4827932 (IDEKER RAYMOND E [US], et al); | [A]US4765341 (MOWER MORTON M [US], et al) |