EP0458322 - Double wall fire proof duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHEA TECHNOLOGY 2809 Mountain Springs Road Reno, Nevada 89509 / US | [1996/10] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states SHEA, Lawrence E 165 Lake Drive San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEA, Lawrence E. 165 Lake Drive San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | [2001/33] |
Former [1991/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91108330.1 | 23.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | US19900528803 | 24.05.1990 Original published format: US 528803 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458322 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458322 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458322 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B32B27/04, F16L58/00 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
B29C53/8075 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/04 (EP,US);
F16L57/04 (EP,US);
F16L58/1009 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (US);
B32B2262/106 (US);
B32B2305/07 (US);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2307/714 (US);
Y10S138/06 (EP,US);
Y10S428/92 (EP,US);
Y10S428/921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1366 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2936 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Doppelwandige feuerbeständige Leitung | [1991/48] | English: | Double wall fire proof duct | [1991/48] | French: | Conduite ignifuge à double paroi | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Request for further processing for: | 21.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.11.2001 | [2004/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU537228 ; | [Y]GB810473 (FRANCIS FERDINAND JARAY); | [A]FR1495535 (FERODO SA); | [A]US3718161 (WOODSON C); | [A]US3891489 (BORDNER DALTON W, et al); | [YD]US4076873 (SHEA LAWRENCE E); | [A]EP0291639 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) | Examination | US5202189 | - ROBERT B. WILLIAMSON, "Advances in Assessment Methods for Fire Safety", FIRE SAFETY JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 20, pages 15 - 38 |