EP0465813 - Actuator unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siebert, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Abelstrasse 37 W-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91108620.5 | 28.05.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19904021623 | 06.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4021623 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465813 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465813 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/16 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
H01F7/1607 (EP);
H01F2007/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/03] | Title | German: | Stelleinrichtung | [1992/03] | English: | Actuator unit | [1992/03] | French: | Dispositif de réglage | [1992/03] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3300437 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3437106 (MARCHAL EQUIP AUTO [FR]); | [A]DE3829676 (OLYMPIA AEG [DE]) |