EP0460596 - Apparatus for correcting a color tone of a video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kageyama, Atsuhisa 8-15, Hoshimi-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/50] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109095.9 | 04.06.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | JP19900148286 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: JP 14828690 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0460596 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0460596 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0460596 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/68 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
H04N9/68 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/77 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Korrektur eines Farbtones eines Videosignales | [1991/50] | English: | Apparatus for correcting a color tone of a video signal | [1991/50] | French: | Appareil pour corriger la teinte d'un signal vidéo | [1991/50] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4337479 (TOMIMOTO TETSUO, et al); | [A]US4812905 (ROSSI JOHN P [US]) | Examination | JP63318888 |