EP0465841 - Quick acting pharmaceutical inhalation forms of diuretics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kibat, Paul-Gerhard, Dr. Gartenstrasse 17 W-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Röthig, Hans-Jürgen, Dr. Am Wäldchen 10 W-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Wirth, Klaus Josef, Dr. Johannesallee 28 W-6230 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91109392.0 | 07.06.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19904018861 | 13.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4018861 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0465841 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0465841 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/72, A61K9/12, A61K9/14 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP);
A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K9/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | Schnellwirksame Inhalationsarzneiformen von Diuretika | [1992/03] | English: | Quick acting pharmaceutical inhalation forms of diuretics | [1992/03] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques des diurétiques pour inhalations à action rapide | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 21.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0386700 ; | [A]US4908382 ; | [A]DE2851489 ; | [A]GB937303 ; | [AD]EP0072046 |