EP0462475 - Thermally stable moulding compositions comprising aromatic polycarbonates, polyesters or polyester carbonates, graft polymers and poly(arylenesulphides) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittmann, Dieter, Dr. Wolfskaul 4 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Eckel, Thomas, Dr. Gneisenaustrasse 15a W-4047 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 W-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Kress, Hans-Jürgen, Dr Scheiblerstrasse 111 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | 05 /
Schoeps, Jochen, Dr. Windmühlenstrasse 126 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | 06 /
Plaetschke, Rüdiger Am Thelenhof 18 W-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1991/52] | Application number, filing date | 91109414.2 | 08.06.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | DE19904019802 | 21.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4019802 | [1991/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0462475 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0462475 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L67/03, C08L51/04, C08L81/04 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L67/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L69/005, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/52] | Title | German: | Thermostabile Formmassen aus aromatischen Polycarbonaten, Polyestern oder Polyestercarbonaten, Pfropfpolymerisaten und Polyarylensulfiden | [1991/52] | English: | Thermally stable moulding compositions comprising aromatic polycarbonates, polyesters or polyester carbonates, graft polymers and poly(arylenesulphides) | [1991/52] | French: | Compositions de moulage thermostables comprenant des polycarbonates, des polyesters ou polyestercarbonates aromatiques, des polymères greffés et des polysulfures d'arylène | [1991/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 29.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3205992 ; | [Y]EP0286965 ; | [X]EP0343442 ; | [A]EP0246016 ; | [A]EP0304040 |