EP0461645 - Process for preparing superconducting oxide thin films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaishi, Tatsuoki, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Hisao, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Itozaki, Hideo, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109666.7 | 12.06.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | JP19900154208 | 13.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15420890 | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0461645 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0461645 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
C23C14/28 (EP,US);
H10N60/0521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung supraleitender oxydischer Dünnschichten | [1991/51] | English: | Process for preparing superconducting oxide thin films | [1991/51] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de films minces supraconducteurs d'oxyde | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/17] | 21.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0341520 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |