EP0461664 - Electromagnetic induction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshikawa, Toru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Ako Seisakusho, 651, Tenwa Ako-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109751.7 | 14.06.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | JP19900062744U | 15.06.1990 Original published format: JP 6274490 U | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461664 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461664 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/08 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
H01F27/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Induktionsanordnung | [1991/51] | English: | Electromagnetic induction device | [1991/51] | French: | Dispositif d'induction électromagnétique | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU626445 ; | [A]JP58107615 ; | [A]JP5941818 ; | [A]GB782130 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]GB887383 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]DE1513847 (ACEC [BE]); | [A]DE1563160 (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG); | [Y]DE3341626 (MAY & CHRISTE GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated Derwent week B29, published 29 august 1979, LONDON & SU-A-626445 (NOGINOVIS), & SU626445 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 214 (E-199)(1359) September 21, 1983 & JP-A-58 107 615 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K. ) June 27, 1983, & JP58107615 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 131 (E-251)(1568) June 19, 1984 & JP-A-59 41 818 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K. ) March 8, 1984, & JP5941818 A 00000000 |