EP0517943 - Copolyestercarbonate polymers derived from diaryl dicarboxylic acids and their derivatives and blends thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bales, Stephen E. 4409 Andre Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
Burdett, Kenneth A. 2800 Diana Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
Lee, Guo-Shuh J. 10 Burrell Ct. Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109753.3 | 14.06.1991 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517943 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/64, C08L65/00 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
C08L69/005 (EP,US);
C08G63/64 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L69/005, C08L2666/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | Copolyestercarbonat-Polymere, basierend auf Diaryldicarbonsäuren und deren Derivaten, und Mischungen daraus | [1992/51] | English: | Copolyestercarbonate polymers derived from diaryl dicarboxylic acids and their derivatives and blends thereof | [1992/51] | French: | Polymères de copolyester carbonates dérivés des acides dicarboxyliques diaryliques et de leur dérivés et leurs compositions | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 21.09.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3346946 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4851014 (JEANES THOMAS O [US]); | [X]EP0414066 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [E]US5045610 (BALES STEPHEN E [US], et al) |