EP0474981 - A package for toasted bread slices and the like food products of flattened shape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARILLA G. e R. F.lli - Società per Azioni Viale Riccardo Barilla, 3/A 43100 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states BARILLA G. e R. F.lli - Società per Azioni Viale Riccardo Barilla, 3/A I-43100 Parma / IT | ||
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states BARILLA G. e R. F.lli - Società per Azioni Viale Riccardo Barilla, 3/A I-43100 Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertozzi, Fausto Via Duccio Galimberti, 10 I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
Righi, Stefano Via Crispi, 10 I-42028 Poviglio (Reggio Emilia) / IT | 03 /
Marchiori, Franco Via del Navile, 1/3 I-40131 Bologna / IT | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Vannini, Torquato, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Vannini, Torquato, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91109790.5 | 14.06.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | IT19900021449 | 12.09.1990 Original published format: IT 2144990 | [1992/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474981 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D85/36 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
B65D75/5838 (EP);
B65D75/5833 (EP);
B65D85/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Verpackung für getoastete Brotscheiben oder ähnliches Nahrungsmittel flacher Gestalt | [1992/12] | English: | A package for toasted bread slices and the like food products of flattened shape | [1992/12] | French: | Emballage pour tranches de pain toasté et produits alimentairs analogues de forme aplatie | [1992/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 10.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/16] | 29.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3291377 (EGGEN REX M); | [Y]FR2123766 (AUCOUTURIER ALBERT); | [A]FR2334584 (WALDHOF ASCHAFFENBURG PAPIER [DE]); | [Y]DE8704209U ; | [A]DE8708274U ; | [A]DE3700988 (SENGEWALD KARL H [DE]) |