EP0464433 - Microcontroller device having remotely programmable EPROM & method of programming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | ||
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 1090 Kifer Road, M/S 16-135 Sunnyvale, CA 95086-3737 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elmer, Thomas I. 1090 Reed Avenue, Apt. 2 Sunnyvale, CA94086 / US | 02 /
Nguyen, Tuan Thanh 1491 Yellowstone Avenue Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 03 /
Lin, Rung-Pan 6946 Blue Hill Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109838.2 | 15.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900545910 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: US 545910 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464433 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464433 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/24, G06F9/44 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F15/7814 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | G06F9/44, G06F9/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Mikrocontroller mit fernprogrammierbarem EPROM und Programmierverfahren dafür | [1992/02] | English: | Microcontroller device having remotely programmable EPROM & method of programming | [1992/02] | French: | Microcontrôleur avec mémoire morte téléprogrammable et la méthode de programmation | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/29] | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8002881 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]WO8603328 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0155403 |