EP0462541 - Image information control device and display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Katsuhiro, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Hiroshi, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/52] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109900.0 | 17.06.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | JP19900160499 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: JP 16049990 | [1991/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0462541 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0462541 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462541 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
G09G5/391 (EP);
G06F3/153 (KR);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G09G3/3629 (EP);
G09G3/3651 (EP);
G09G5/399 (EP);
G09G2310/0227 (EP);
G09G2320/041 (EP);
G09G2340/0407 (EP);
G09G2360/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | Bildinformationssteuergerät und Anzeigesystem | [1991/52] | English: | Image information control device and display system | [1991/52] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'information d'image et système d'affichage | [1991/52] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.1997 | BE | 02.04.1997 | CH | 02.04.1997 | DK | 02.04.1997 | ES | 02.04.1997 | GR | 02.04.1997 | IT | 02.04.1997 | LI | 02.04.1997 | NL | 02.04.1997 | LU | 17.06.1997 | SE | 02.07.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
ES | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 17.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
ES | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
CH | 07.07.1997 | ||
LI | 07.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 02.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0288168 (CANON KK [JP]); | [AP]EP0411464 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS vol. CE-33, no. 3, August 1987, NEW YORK, N.Y., USA pages 359 - 365; TSUGUJI TACHIUCHI ET AL.: 'A color LCD controller' |