EP0469274 - Ultrasonic inspection and imaging instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arima, Yukio 4-24 Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanagimoto, Hiroaki 1828 Ohaza-Niihari, Chiyoda-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Kunitomo, Yuichi 12-12 Johokucho Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Makihara, Shouya 1828 Ohaza-Niihari, Chiyoda-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Tominaga, Tetsuyoshi 1828 Ohaza-Niihari, Chiyoda-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109967.9 | 18.06.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19900172370 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: JP 17237090 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469274 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469274 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469274 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G06F3/033 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
G01S7/52074 (EP,US);
G01N29/04 (KR);
G01N29/0609 (EP,US);
G01N29/0645 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/06] | G01S7/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/06] | Title | German: | Ultraschalluntersuchungs- und Abbildungsgerät | [1992/06] | English: | Ultrasonic inspection and imaging instrument | [1992/06] | French: | Instrument d'imagerie et d'inspection ultrasonores | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62226375 ; | [X]FR2623997 (CGR ULTRASONIC [FR]); | [A]DE3940051 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US4141347 (GREEN PHILIP S, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 93 (P-680)26 March 1988 & JP-A-62 226 375 ( RICOH ), & JP62226375 A 19880326 |