EP0464496 - Method for synchronously interlocking feed axes of a lathe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kiyoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Nagoya Works, 1-14, Yadaminami 5-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110184.8 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900177865 | 05.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17786590 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464496 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464496 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464496 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/416, B23B3/06 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
B23B3/06 (EP,US);
G05B19/416 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42186 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45125 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50216 (EP,US);
Y10T82/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/24] | G05B19/00, B23B3/30, B23B5/08, B23Q15/013 | ||
Former IPC [1992/02] | B23B3/30, B23B5/08, B23Q15/013, G05B19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Synchronisieren sich simultan bewegender Vorschubachsen einer Drehbank | [1992/02] | English: | Method for synchronously interlocking feed axes of a lathe | [1992/02] | French: | Méthode pour la synchronisation des déplacements simultanés des axes d'avance d'un tour | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP1228752 ; | [A]EP0335659 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]); | [AP]EP0422651 (GILDEMEISTER AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0364593 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]DE8530182U | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 555 (M-904)(3903) 11 December 1989 & JP-A-1 228 752 ( FANUC LTD ) 12 September 1989, & JP1228752 A 19890912 |