EP0465900 - Oxazolane mixtures essentially containing bisoxazolanes, a process for their preparation and their use as hardener for polymer precursor with isocyanate groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/03] | Bisoxazolanes, oxazolane mixtures containing essentially those bisoxazolanes, a process for their preparation and their use as hardener for polymer precursor with isocyanate groups | ||
[1995/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blum, Harald, Dr. Auf dem Westkamp 1 W-4175 Wachtendonk 1 / DE | 02 /
Pedain, Josef, Dr. Haferkamp 6 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Hentschel, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Friedrich-Offermann-Strasse 57c W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91110324.0 | 22.06.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19904021659 | 07.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4021659 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465900 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465900 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/04, C08G18/38 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C07D263/04 (EP,US);
C08G18/3296 (EP,US);
C08G18/3844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | Im wesentlichen aus Bisoxazolanen bestehende Oxazolangemische, ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Härter für Isocyanatgruppen aufweisende Kunststoffvorläufer | [1995/36] | English: | Oxazolane mixtures essentially containing bisoxazolanes, a process for their preparation and their use as hardener for polymer precursor with isocyanate groups | [1995/36] | French: | Mélanges d'oxazolanes essentiellement contenant des bisoxazolanes, procédé pour les préparer et leur utilisation comme durcisseur de précurseurs de polymères à groupe isocyanate | [1995/36] |
Former [1992/03] | Bisoxazolane, im wesentlichen aus diesen bestehende Oxazolangemische, ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Härter für Isocyanatgruppen aufweisende Kunststoffvorläufer | ||
Former [1992/03] | Bisoxazolanes, oxazolane mixtures containing essentially those bisoxazolanes, a process for their preparation and their use as hardener for polymer precursor with isocyanate groups | ||
Former [1992/03] | Bisoxazolanes, mélanges d'oxazolanes contenant essentiellement ces bisoxazolanes, procédé pour les préparer et leur utilisation comme durcisseur de précurseurs de polymères à groupe isocyanate | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2446438 (BAYER AG); | [A]EP0228935 (CHRYSO SA [FR]); | [A]EP0260339 (ASHLAND OIL INC [US]); | [X]EP0329375 (INT PAINT PLC [GB]) |