EP0464586 - Process and device for catalytic waste air purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTG Lufttechnische GmbH Postfach 40 05 49 D-70405 Stuttgart / DE | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Mettinger Strasse 35 W-7300 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Mokler, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Schwalbenweg 26 W-7030 Böblingen / DE | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110441.2 | 25.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | DE19904020657 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020657 | [1992/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464586 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464586 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
F23G7/07 (EP);
B01D53/8668 (EP);
F23G7/068 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur katalytischen Abluftreinigung | [1992/02] | English: | Process and device for catalytic waste air purification | [1992/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la purification catalytique d'air d'échappement | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.06.1995 | BE | 30.06.1995 | CH | 30.06.1995 | LI | 30.06.1995 | [1997/13] |
Former [1996/30] | GB | 25.06.1995 | |
BE | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 30.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0194430 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0226203 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INSTYTUT [PL]); | [A]DD279185 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INSTYTUT [PL]); | [AD]DE3505354 (LINDE AG [DE]) |