EP0467116 - Dermatological compositions containing cis-urocanic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GS DEVELOPMENT AB Jägershillgatan 15 213 75 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states GS DEVELOPMENT AB Jägerhillgatan 15 213 75 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states Bode Chemie GmbH & Co. Melanchthonstrasse 27 D-22525 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stäb, Franz, Dr. Bäckerstrasse 3 W-2171 Echem / DE | 02 /
Sauermann, Gerhard, Dr. Hambrook 14 W-2351 Wiemersdorf / DE | 03 /
Hoppe, Udo, Dr. Lottbeker Weg 7 W-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE | 04 /
Engel, Walter Diesterwegstrasse 22 W-2080 Pinneberg / DE | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Dinné, Erlend, et al Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1992/04] | Dinné, Erlend Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110528.6 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | DE19904020739 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020739 | [1992/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467116 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467116 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0467116 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K7/48 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/4946 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61Q19/005 (EP);
A61Q7/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/04] | Title | German: | Dermatologische Zusammensetzungen mit einem Gehalt an cis-Urocaninsäure | [1992/04] | English: | Dermatological compositions containing cis-urocanic acid | [1992/04] | French: | Compositions dermatologiques contenant de l'acide cis-urocanique | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.1996
24.05.1996
ADMISSIBLE Bioglan Laboratories Ltd 5 Hunting Gate Hitchin, Herts SG4 OTJ / GB Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon (GB), et al, et al Venner, Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain GB-London EC1A 7DH / GB | [1996/27] | 13.06.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.03.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M12) | 29.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.11.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.07.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 09.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 92, Nr. 22, Juni 1980, Seite 287, Zusammenfassung Nr. 185715c, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. OHNISHI et al.: "Study on urocanic acid in the human skin surface. II. Geometrical isomers and sunscreen effect", & J. SCCJ 1979, 13(2), 61-6 | [A] - ARCHIVES DE BIOCHEMIE ET COSMETOLOGIE, Band 11, Nr. 108, 1968, Seiten 21-28, Les Editions Varia, Paris, FR; J. MORELLE: "L'etat actuel de nos connaissances sur l'acide urocanique" | Opposition | - Photochem.Photobiol., 1989, 50(2), pp.267-275 (Norval et al.) |