EP0469296 - Assembly for sealing containers by induction welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Jin-Liou 1079 Foxhurst Way San Jose, California 95120 / US | 02 /
Rough, J. Kirkwood H. 264 South 14th Street Santa Clara, California 95112 / US | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/06] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110578.1 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | US19900572821 | 03.08.1990 Original published format: US 572821 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469296 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/22, B65B7/28 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
B29C66/53461 (EP);
B29C65/3644 (EP);
B29C65/3656 (EP);
B29C65/368 (EP);
B29C65/7847 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/72321 (EP);
B29C66/80 (EP);
B29C66/81427 (EP);
B29C66/81431 (EP);
B29C66/8242 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B65B31/028 (EP);
B65B51/227 (EP);
B65B7/2878 (EP);
B29C66/24221 (EP);
B29C66/24223 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Versiegeln von Behältern durch Induktionsschweissung | [1992/06] | English: | Assembly for sealing containers by induction welding | [1992/06] | French: | Appareil pour sceller des récipients au moyen de soudage par induction | [1992/06] | File destroyed: | 28.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0362799 (CONTINENTAL CAN CO [US]); | [X]US4909022 (KUBIS CHARLES S [US], et al); | [X]EP0350601 (CONTINENTAL CAN CO [US]); | [A]EP0214372 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0223517 (CONTINENTAL CAN CO [US]); | [A]FR2199527 (STEL [FR]) |