EP0464648 - 4-Cyano-3-fluorophenyl esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchecker, Richard, Dr. Felsenstrasse 10 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Schadt, Martin, Dr. Liestalerstrasse 77 CH-4411 Seltisberg / CH | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Cottong, Norbert A., et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Cottong, Norbert A., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 91110584.9 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | CH19900002254 | 06.07.1990 Original published format: CH 225490 | [1992/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464648 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464648 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/06, C07D239/26, C07C255/50, C09K19/30, C09K19/34 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
C07D239/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07C255/57 (KR);
C07C255/55 (EP,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,US);
C09K19/08 (KR);
C09K19/20 (KR);
C09K19/3068 (EP,US);
C09K19/3402 (EP,US);
C09K19/3469 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | 4-Cyano-3-fluorophenylester | [1992/02] | English: | 4-Cyano-3-fluorophenyl esters | [1992/02] | French: | Esters de 4-cyano-3-fluorophényl | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3515633 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3302218 (WERK FERNSEHELEKTRONIK VEB [DD]); | [A]DD252828 (MARTIN LUTHER UNI SEKTION CHEM [DD]) | Examination | JPS506637 |