EP0464712 - Display/input control system for software keyboard in information processing apparatus having integral display/input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1994 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Takafumi, c/o Intellectual Pty. Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Hiroyuki, c/o Intellectual Pty. Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kamiyama, Yutaka, c/o Intellectual Pty. Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110761.3 | 28.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900168406 | 28.06.1990 Original published format: JP 16840690 | JP19900328459 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32845990 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464712 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464712 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Anzeige/Eingabesteuersystem für virtuelle Tastatur in einem Informationsverarbeitungsgerät mit integrierter Anzeige/Eingabevorrichtung | [1992/02] | English: | Display/input control system for software keyboard in information processing apparatus having integral display/input device | [1992/02] | French: | Système de commande d'affichage/entrée pour clavier virtuel dans des appareils de traitement d'informations ayant un dispositif intégré affichage/entrée | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 17.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP01230114 ; | [X]EP0271280 ; | [Y]US4185282 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 29, no. 10, March 1987, NEW YORK US pages 4553 - 4554 'METHOD FOR KEEPING WINDOWS FROM OVERLAYING IMPORTANT INFORMATION' | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 554 (P-973)11 December 1989 & JP-A-01 230 114 ( CANON INC ) 13 September 1989, & JP01230114 A 19890913 |