EP0464722 - Aperture fluorescent lamp with press seal configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states GTE PRODUCTS CORPORATION 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaisdell, Ronald G. 15 Dustin St. Saugus, Ma 01906 / US | 02 /
Pai, Robert Y. 27 Juniper Rd. Hamilton, MA 01982 / US | 03 /
Lima, Joseph V. 3 Pyburn Ave. Salem, MA 01970 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Butler, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1992/02] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110787.8 | 28.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900547984 | 03.07.1990 Original published format: US 547984 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464722 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464722 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464722 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/30, H01J61/70, H01J61/36 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
H01J5/52 (EP,US);
H01J61/368 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | H01J61/30, H01J61/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | Leuchtstofflampe mit einem Fenster und Quetschdichtungen | [1996/50] | English: | Aperture fluorescent lamp with press seal configuration | [1992/02] | French: | Lampe fluorescente à ouverture et à embases à pincement | [1996/50] |
Former [1992/02] | Leuchtstofflampe mit einer Öffnung und Quetschungsgestaltung | ||
Former [1992/02] | Lampe fluorescente à ouverture à configuration de pincements | Examination procedure | 20.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Request for further processing for: | 24.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.12.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2094668 (MARCELLO PIRANI, et al); | [A]EP0061758 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | [AD]US4593958 (BABA MASAHARU [JP]) | [X] - INFORMATION DISPLAY. vol. 5, no. 11, November 1989, NEW YORK US pages 8 - 13; W. B. MERCER ET AL.: 'Fluorescent backlights for LCDs' |