EP0465973 - Process for forming photosensitive imaging members for suppressing the Plywood effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/03] | Plywood effect suppression in photosensitive imaging members | ||
[1999/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Yonn K. 16 Windsor Way Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 02 /
Grabowski, Edward F. 479 Sherborne Road Webster, New York 14580 / US | 03 /
Teney, Donald J. 49 Tanglewood Drive Rochester, New York 14616 / US | [1999/03] |
Former [1992/03] | 01 /
Simpson, Yonn K. 16 Windsor Way Fairport, New York 14450 / US | ||
02 /
Grabowski, Edward F. 479 Sherborne Road Wester, New York 14580 / US | |||
03 /
Teney, Donald J. 49 Tanglewood Drive Rochester, New York 14616 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110843.9 | 01.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | US19900546990 | 02.07.1990 Original published format: US 546990 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465973 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465973 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/10 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
G03G5/102 (EP,US);
G03G5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/03] | Title | German: | Methode für die Herstellung von lichtempfindlichen Bildherstellungselementen um die Interferenzeffekten zu unterdrücken | [1999/03] | English: | Process for forming photosensitive imaging members for suppressing the Plywood effect | [1999/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'éléments de formation d'images photosensibles pour supprimer les effects d'interférences | [1999/03] |
Former [1992/03] | Unterdrückung von Interferenzeffekten in lichtempfindlichen Bildherstellungselementen | ||
Former [1992/03] | Plywood effect suppression in photosensitive imaging members | ||
Former [1992/03] | Suppression d'effets d'interférence dans des éléments de formation d'images photosensibles | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/21] |
Former [2000/12] | DE | 21.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63037355 ; | [A]JP2059765 ; | [A]JP62199772 ; | [A]GB2136451 (GEN ELECTRIC PLC) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 245 (P-729)(3092) 12 July 1988 & JP-A-63 037 355 ( FUJI XEROX CO. ) 18 February 1988, & JP63037355 A 19880218 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 238 (P-1050)(4181) 21 May 1990 & JP-A-2 059 765 ( FUJITSU LTD. ) 28 February 1990, & JP2059765 A 19900228 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 56 (C-477)(2903) 19 February 1988 & JP-A-62 199 772 ( CANON INC. ) 3 September 1988, & JP62199772 A 19880903 |