EP0464765 - Space telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL ESPACE 11, avenue Dubonnet F-92407 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blachier, Bruno 7, rue du Général Cordonnier F-92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Vidal Saint-André, Bruno 82, rue Alfred Dumeril F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Renaudin, Thierry c/o STEI, 18, rue du Dr. Zamenhof F-92131 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110938.7 | 02.07.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | FR19900008394 | 03.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9008394 | [1992/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464765 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464765 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/204 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/2041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/02] | Title | German: | Weltraumnachrichtenübertragungssystem | [1992/02] | English: | Space telecommunications system | [1992/02] | French: | Système spatial de télécommunications | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4456988 | [A] - ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM 1988, Syracuse, NY, 6-10 juin 1988, vol. II, pages 510-513, IEEE, New York, US; P. BALLING et al.: "Reconfigurable contoured beam antenna using fixed sub-beam forming networks" | [A] - NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1979, Washington, DC, 27-29 novembre 1979, vol. 3, pages 52.4.1 - 52.4.5, IEEE, New York, US; A.T. ALPER et al.: "Satellite system considerations for the optimum use of reconfigurable transmit multiple beam antennas" | [A] - JOURNAL OF SPACECRAFT AND ROCKETS, vol. 17, no. 1, janvier-février 1980, pages 9-14, American Institute of Aeronautics and Astronautics, New York, US; D.O. REUDINK et al.: "Rapid-scan area-coverage communication satellite" | Examination | - multiple beam antennas" |