EP0470368 - Method and circuit for inductive measuring of conductivity of liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schilling Chemie GmbH u. Produktion KG Steinbeisstrasse 20-22 D-71691 Freiberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Schilling Chemie GmbH u. Produktions KG Steinbeisstrasse 20-22 D-71691 Freiberg / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states Schilling, Gerhard Eichendorffstrasse 117 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorsch, Manfred, Prof.Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 90 W-6962 Adelsheim / DE | 02 /
Szulerecki, Gregor Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Leibl-Strasse 27 W-7100 Heilbronn / DE | 03 /
Haak, Kurt Schulstrasse 42 W-7129 Ilsfeld-Auenstein / DE | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Clemens, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | Hach, Hans Karl, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach, Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110995.7 | 03.07.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | DE19904025093 | 08.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025093 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0470368 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0470368 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470368 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, G01R27/22 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
G01R27/22 (EP);
G01N27/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zur induktiven Messung der Leitfähigkeit in Flüssigkeiten | [1992/07] | English: | Method and circuit for inductive measuring of conductivity of liquids | [1992/07] | French: | Procédé et circuit pour la mesure par induction de la conductivité dans les liquides | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.02.1997 | FR | 12.02.1997 | GB | 12.02.1997 | IT | 12.02.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 12.02.1997 | |
GB | 12.02.1997 | ||
IT | 12.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 12.02.1997 | |
IT | 12.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 12.02.1997 | |
FR | 11.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | FR | 11.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3389332 (KETCHAM GEORGE M); | [A]US3491287 (BROWN NEIL L); | [A]US3510761 (BROWN NEIL L); | [A]DE1598075 (BASF AG); | [AD]DE2822943 (TESCH GMBH & CO KG) |