EP0468237 - Method of and apparatus for rewritable recording and erasing and rewritable recording film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Keiki, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Seikatsu System Kenkyusho, 14-40, Ohfuna 2-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohnishi, Masaru, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Seikatsu System Kenkyusho, 14-40, Ohfuna 2-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111046.8 | 03.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | JP19900176758 | 04.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17675890 | JP19910045689 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4568991 | JP19910162284 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16228491 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468237 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468237 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468237 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/28 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B41M5/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die wiedereinschreibbare und löschbare Aufzeichnung und wiedereinschreibbarer Aufzeichnungsfilm | [1992/05] | English: | Method of and apparatus for rewritable recording and erasing and rewritable recording film | [1992/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'enregistrement réinscriptible et effacement, film pour l'enregistrement réinscriptible | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3683336 (BROWNLEE THOMAS HARLAND, et al); | [A]US3789420 (CLAYTOR R, et al); | [Y]US4700200 (HIBINO IKUO [JP]); | [Y]US4837071 (TAGOKU IZUMI [JP], et al); | [XPD]EP0418399 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0461606 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) |