EP0522184 - Method of regulating a rolling mill with variable roll gap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Andreas-Paulus-Strasse 47 W-8521 Spardorf / DE | [1993/02] | Application number, filing date | 91111158.1 | 04.07.1991 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522184 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522184 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/08 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
B21B37/52 (EP);
B21B37/58 (EP);
B21B1/0805 (EP);
B21B27/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung eines Walzwerks mit betriebsmässig veränderlichem Walzspalt | [1993/02] | English: | Method of regulating a rolling mill with variable roll gap | [1993/02] | French: | Procédé pour le réglage d'un laminoir à calibre plat variable | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.12.1993 | NL | 15.12.1993 | LU | 31.07.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/48] | BE | 15.12.1993 | |
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 15.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3517475 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3931242 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]); | [AD]DE3903589 |