EP0466117 - Visual information processing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/03] | Visual information processing device | ||
[1999/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isoda, Satoru, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho, Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 1-1, Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hanazato, Yoshio, c/o Chuo Kenyusho, Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 1-1, Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Ueyama, Satoshi, c/o Chuo Kenyusho, Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 1-1, Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawakubo, Hiroaki, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho, Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 1-1, Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Nishikawa, Satoshi, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho, Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 1-1, Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111434.6 | 09.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | JP19900184525 | 10.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18452590 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0466117 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0466117 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466117 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/03] | Title | German: | Optische Informationsverarbeitungsanlagen | [1999/42] | English: | Visual information processing devices | [1999/42] | French: | Dispositifs de traitement d'information visuel | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/03] | Optische Informationsverarbeitungsanlage | ||
Former [1992/03] | Visual information processing device | ||
Former [1992/03] | Dispositif de traitement d'information visuel | Examination procedure | 09.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4766471 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US4760437 (DENKER JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 30 * | [A] - OHTA, "GaAs/AlGaAs optical synaptic interconnection device for neural networks", OPTICS LETTERS, WASHINGTON US, (19890815), vol. 14, no. 16, pages 844 - 846 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - MITSUBISHI, "Biodevice uses protein conductivity", NIKKEI HIGH TECH REPORT, LONDON GB, (19890522), vol. IV, no. 14, page 11 [A] 1,2 * page 11, column L, line 1 - column M, line 3 * | [A] - YONEZU, "An optoelectronic synaptic connection circuit with variable analog and nonvolatile weights", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO JP, (199007), vol. 29, no. 7/2, pages 1314 - 1316 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | - K. KOCH ET AL., NEURAL COMPUTERS, (1988), page 101 |