EP0468280 - Emulsified alkenylsuccinic acid sizing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Oil Company, Limited no. 2-4, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Oil Company, Limited no. 2-4, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yoshio 1-33-4, Sakuragaoka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Okazaki, Junji 6-7-14-207, Kitaterao, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Umekawa, Hideto 6-7-13-102, Kitaterao, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Tahara, Toshihiro 2-10-1, Dojyo Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111482.5 | 10.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | JP19900185054 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18505490 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468280 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468280 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468280 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/72, // D21H17/16, D21H17/04, D21H17/14, D21H17/20, D21H17/42, D21H17/47, D21H17/60, D21H17/62 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
D21H17/00 (EP,US);
D21H17/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | D21H17/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Emulgierte Alkenylbernsteinsäure als Leimungsmittel | [1995/39] | English: | Emulsified alkenylsuccinic acid sizing agent | [1992/05] | French: | Agent d'encollage à base d'acide alkénylsuccinique émulsifié | [1992/05] |
Former [1992/05] | Emulzifierte Alkenylbernsteinsäure als Leimungsmittel | Examination procedure | 04.11.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59223398 ; | [X]GB2137613 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD, et al); | [X]GB2122659 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8505, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A97, AN 85-028420 & JP-A-59 223 398 (SEIKO CHEM IND KK ET AL.) 15 December 1984, & JP59223398 A 19841215 |