EP0467219 - Conductive sensors and their use in diagnostic assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | ||
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MILES INC. One Mellon Center 500 Grant St. Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musho, Matthew K. 10648 N. Pheasant Cove Drive Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | 02 /
Noell, J. Oakey 50560 King Richards Way Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | 03 /
Tse, Pius H-S. 436 Rivers Edge Drive Mishawaka, Indiana 46544 / US | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Dietrich, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Kirchner, Dietrich, et al Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1992/04] | Kirchner, Dietrich, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111538.4 | 11.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | US19900554393 | 19.07.1990 Original published format: US 554393 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467219 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467219 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467219 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12M1/40 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP);
C12Q1/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | Leitende Sensoren und ihre Verwendung in diagnostischen Tests | [1992/04] | English: | Conductive sensors and their use in diagnostic assays | [1992/04] | French: | Senseurs conductibles et leurs applications dans les essais diagnostiques | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0314009 (MILES INC [US]) | [YD] - BIOSENSORS vol. 3, 1987, LONDON UK pages 71 - 87 M.K. MALMROS ET AL. 'A semiconductive polymer film sensor for glucose.' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, FARADAY TRANSCRIPTS I vol. 84, no. 7, 1988, LONDON UK pages 2259 - 2265 P.C. PANDEY 'A new conducting polymer-coated glucose sensor.' | by applicant | EP0096095 | US4444892 | EP0185941 | EP0193154 | EP0204468 | US4711742 | US4717673 | US4721601 | - M.S. WRIGHTON, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 231, page 32 | - A.F. DIAZ ET AL., J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 133, page 233 | - M.V. ROSENTHAL ET AL., J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM. AND INTERFAC. CHEM., (1985), vol. 1, page 297 | - G. BIDAN ET AL., SYNTH MET., (1986), vol. 15, page 51 | - E.M. GENIES ET AL., SYNTH. MET., (1984), vol. 10, page 27 | - J.P. TRAVERS ET AL., MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST., (1985), vol. 118, page 149 | - G. TOURILLON, Handbook of Conducting Polymers, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1986), page 293 | - R.J. WALTHAM ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1983), vol. 87, page 1459 | - G. TOURILLON ET AL., J. POLYM. SCI. POLYM. PHYS. ED., (1984), vol. 22, page 33 | - G. TOURILLON ET AL., J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 161, page 51 | - A.F. DIAZ; J. BARGON, Handbook of Conducting Polymers, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1986), page 81 | - G. TOURILLON ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1983), vol. 87, page 2289 | - A. CZERWINSKI ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1985), vol. 132, page 2669 | - K. JEN ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1988), page 215 | - R. L. ELSENBAUMER ET AL., ELECTRONIC PROPERTIES OF CONJUGATED POLYMERS, (1987), page 400 | - M.K. MALMROS ET AL., "A Semiconductive Polymer Film Sensor for Glucose", BIOSENSORS, (1987), vol. 3, pages 71 - 87 | - ELSENBAUMER ET AL., "Processible, Environmentally Stable, Highly Conductive Forms of Polythiophene", SYNTH. MET., (1987), vol. 18, pages 277 - 282 | - JEN ET AL., "Processible and Environmentally Stable Conducting Polymers", POLYMERIC MATERIAL, (1985), vol. 13, pages 79 - 84 | - HOTTA ET AL., "Novel Organosynthetic Routes to Polythiophene and Its Derivatives", SYNTH. MET., (1988), vol. 26, pages 267 - 279 | - "Preparation and Properties of Conducting Heterocyclic Polymer Films by Chemical Method", JPN. JOURN. APPL. PHYS., (1984), vol. 23, pages 2899 - 2900 | - "Electrical and Optical Properties of Poly(3-alkylthiophene) in Liquid State", SOLID STATE COMMUN., (1988), vol. 67, pages 1119 - 1121 | - "Absorption and Emission Spectral Changes in a Poly(3-alkylthiophene) Solution with Solvent and Temperature", JPN. JOURN. APPL. PHYS., (1987), vol. 26, pages L2046 - L2048 | - NAGY ET AL., "Enzyme Electrode for Glucose Based on an Iodide Membrane Sensor", ANALYTICA CHIM. ACTA., (1973), vol. 66, pages 443 - 455 | - MULLEN ET AL., "Glucose Enzyme Electrode with Extended Linearity", ANALYTICA. CHEM. ACTA., (1986), vol. 183, pages 59 - 66 | - M.B. MCDONELL; P.M. VADGAMA, "Membranes: Separation Principles and Sensing", SELECTIVE ELECTRODE REV., (1989), vol. 11, pages 17 - 67 | - L.C. CLARK ET AL., "Long-lived Implanted Silastic Drum Glucose Sensors", TRANS. AM. SOC. ARTIF. INTERN. ORGANS, (1987), vol. XXXIV, pages 323 - 328 | - P. VADGAMA ET AL., "The Glucose Enzyme Electrode: Is Simple Peroxide Detection at a Needle Sensor Acceptable?", IMPLANTABLE GLUCOSE SENSORS - THE STATE OF THE ART, INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, REISENSBURG, (1987), pages 20 - 22 | - P. VADGAMA, "Diffusion Limited Enzyme Electrodes", ANAL. USES OF IMMOBILIZED BIOLOGICAL COMPOUNDS FOR DETECTION, MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL USES, (1988), pages 359 - 377 | - W.H. MULLEN ET AL., "Design of Enzyme Electrodes for Measurements in Undiluted Blood", ANALYTICAL PROCEEDINGS, (1987), vol. 24, pages 147 - 148 | - Y. IKARIYAMA ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 58, page 1803 | - C. NYLANDER ET AL., "Anal. Chem. Symp. Ser.", CHEM SENS, (1983), vol. 17, page 159 | - H. S. WHITE ET AL., J. AM CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, page 5317 | - G.P. KITTLESEN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, page 7389 | - M. UMANA; J. WALLER, ANAL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 58, page 2979 | - CASS ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 56, page 607 | - BIOSENSORS, INSTRUMENTATION AND PROCESSING, THE WORLD BIOTECH. REPORT, (1987), vol. 1, page 125 | - Y. DEGANI; A. HELLER, J. PHYS. CHEM., (1987), vol. 91, page 1285 | - C.J. MCNEIL ET AL., BIOSENSORS, (1987), vol. 3, pages 199 - 209 | - I. HANNIG ET AL., "Improved Blood Compatibility at a Glucose Enzyme Electrode Used for Extra Corporeal Monitoring", ANAL. LETTERS, (1986), vol. 19, no. 3-4, pages 461 - 478 | - BURKS; HODGE, J. CHEM. PHYS., (1985), vol. 83, page 5796 |