EP0468293 - Metallic water borne base coat composition based on acrylic latex resins using a water reducible resin for aluminium storage and a hectorite clay for rheology control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation Inmont Division 1255 Broad Street P.O. Box 6001 Clifton New Jersey 07015-6001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states BASF Corporation Inmont Division, 1255 Broad Street, P.O. Box 6001 Clifton, New Jersey 07015-6001 / US | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 26701 Telegraph Road Southfield, Michigan 48086-5009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, James L. Jr. 10655 Box Road Grand Rapids, Ohio 43522 / US | 02 /
Finkenauer, Horst J. 3 Zopan Bang Pune, India 411004 / IN | 03 /
Newton, David L. 2565 Pershing Drive Toledo, Ohio 43613 / US | 04 /
McClanahan, Craig 51 Darlyn Drive Bowling Green, Ohio 43402 / US | 05 /
Bard, Charles Z. 1415 Wilderness Maumee, Ohio 43537 / US | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Münch, Volker Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Münch, Volker, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Münch, Volker, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation, Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1992/05] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patentabteilung Glasuritstrasse 1 Postfach 61 23 W-4400 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111566.5 | 11.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | US19900553063 | 13.07.1990 Original published format: US 553063 | US19900553065 | 10.09.1990 Original published format: US 553065 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468293 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468293 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/38, C09D133/00, C09D5/04 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B05D7/53 (EP);
B05D5/068 (EP);
C09D5/002 (EP);
C09D5/38 (EP);
B05D2451/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Wässerige Metallic-Grundierungszusammensetzung auf Basis von Acryl-Latex-Harzen unter Verwendung eines wasserverdünnbaren Harzes als Medium für das Aluminium und Hectorit-Ton zur Rheologie-Regelung | [1992/05] | English: | Metallic water borne base coat composition based on acrylic latex resins using a water reducible resin for aluminium storage and a hectorite clay for rheology control | [1992/05] | French: | Composition aqueuse de couche de fond métallisée à base de résines latex acryliques utilisant une résine réductible par l'eau comme milieu pour l'aluminium et un argile hectorite pour la régulation de la rhéologie | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3741922 (GLOMSKI R, et al); | [A]US3761432 (FRITSCHE P); | [A]US3953644 (CAMELON MELVILLE J, et al); | [X]US4880673 (TORK LEO [DE], et al) | Examination | EP0399427 |