EP0466190 - Quantizing error reducer for audio signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akagiri, Kenzo, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Akune, Makoto, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/03] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111688.7 | 12.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | JP19900185555 | 13.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18555590 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0466190 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0466190 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466190 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, H03M7/30, H03M1/00, H04B14/04 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
H04B1/665 (EP,US);
H04B14/046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/03] | G11B20/10, H03M7/30, H03M1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/03] | Title | German: | Quantisierungsfehlerverminderer für Audiosignal | [1992/03] | English: | Quantizing error reducer for audio signal | [1992/03] | French: | Réducteur d'erreur de quantification pour des signaux audio | [1992/03] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.1996 | Decision despatched | 04.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 27.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3440613 (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH); | [A]EP0182915 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [Y] - ICASSP '79 April 1979, NY pages 453 - 455 ATAL ET AL 'Optimizing Predictive Coders for Minimum Audible Noise' |