EP0473911 - Method for mounting electronic parts on a printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamashima, Jun c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ide, Masatoshi c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111796.8 | 15.07.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | JP19900234421 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23442190 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0473911 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0473911 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473911 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, H05K3/34, H01L21/00 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
H05K13/0469 (EP,US);
H05K3/30 (KR);
H05K3/305 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0129 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0162 (EP,US);
H05K2203/013 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0786 (EP,US);
H05K2203/102 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/11] | H05K13/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Montage von elektronischen Bauteilen auf einer Leiterplatte | [1992/11] | English: | Method for mounting electronic parts on a printed circuit board | [1992/11] | French: | Méthode pour le montage de composants électroniques sur une plaquette à circuit imprimé | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.07.1995 | [1996/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219177 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [A]US3963551 (MARLINSKI EDWARD J); | [A]EP0171466 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO8501634 (DORTRELL LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2109716 (IBM); | [AD]US4314870 (ISHIDA TOSHIMICHI, et al) |