EP0467332 - Color cathode-ray tube apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urata, Hiroshi, c/o Intellectual Property Division KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Sone, Toshinao, c/o Intellectual Property Division KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Nakane, Kazunori, c/0 Intellectual Property Div. KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Satou, Kazunori, c/o Intellectual Property Div. KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 05 /
Tokita, Kiyoshi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111950.1 | 17.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900188236 | 17.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18823690 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467332 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467332 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467332 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/20, H04N9/28 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
H01J31/203 (EP,US);
H04N9/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/04] | Title | German: | Anordnung mit Farb-Kathodenstrahlröhre | [1992/04] | English: | Color cathode-ray tube apparatus | [1992/04] | French: | Appareil contenant un tube cathodique en couleurs | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2327766 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US3638065 (UENO ICHIRO); | [A]US4342029 (HOFMANIS ILMARS A, et al) |