EP0467356 - Treatment system having gate device for decompression chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 2-3-1, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 2-3-1, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneko, Satoshi 1-15-21, Tsunashimanishi, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112019.4 | 18.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900192472 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19247290 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467356 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467356 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467356 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H01J37/18 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
H01L21/67126 (EP,US);
H01L21/30 (KR);
H01J37/18 (EP,US);
H01J37/3405 (EP,US);
H01J2237/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/04] | Title | German: | Verfahrensapparatur mit Türvorrichtung für Dekompressionskammer | [1992/04] | English: | Treatment system having gate device for decompression chamber | [1992/04] | French: | Appareil de traitement ayant un dispositif à porte pour chambre de décompression | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0152555 (PLASMA THERM INC [US]); | [Y]EP0179610 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]US4640223 (DOZIER ALFRED R [US]); | [A]EP0367424 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]DE4019385 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [Y] - G. NIEMANN 'Maschinenelemente Band I' 1981 , SPRINGER-VERLAG , BERLIN HEIDELBERG NEW YORK |