EP0473920 - Thickening copolymers and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konrad, Gerd, Dr. Albert-Einstein-Allee 33 W-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
Hartmann, Heinrich, Dr. Weinheimerstrasse 46 W-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1992/11] | Application number, filing date | 91112090.5 | 19.07.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | DE19904024207 | 31.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4024207 | [1992/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473920 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473920 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/54, C08F246/00, C08F222/38, C09D11/02 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
C09K8/882 (EP,US);
C08F220/56 (EP,US);
C08F222/38 (EP,US);
C08F246/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C09K3/00 (EP,US);
C09K8/12 (EP,US);
C09K8/588 (EP,US);
C09K8/68 (EP,US);
C09K8/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/11] | Title | German: | Wassereindickende Copolymere und deren Verwendung | [1992/11] | English: | Thickening copolymers and their use | [1992/11] | French: | Copolymères epaississants et leur usage | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4663408 (SCHULZ DONALD N [US], et al); | [AD]DE3627456 (CHEVRON RES [US]); | [A]DE3427220 (CASSELLA AG [DE]); | [A]DE3730781 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2533204 (CALDWELL JOHN R); | [A]EP0259581 (BASF AG [DE]) |