EP0469449 - Diazabicyclononyl derivatives as 5-HT3 receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/06] | Azabicyclo derivatives | ||
[1997/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO., LTD. 19-12, Nihonbashi-koami-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [1992/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Haruhiko 7-20, Matsugaoka 5-chome, Tsurugashimamachi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Satoh, Hiroaki 23-16, Midorigaoka 2-chome, Ohimachi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Yahata, Nobuhiro, Corp KA 101 7-33, Tsurugamai 3-chome, Ohimachi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Hagihara, Koichiro, Castle Me Jour Dai-Ni-Miyoshi 408, 247-8, Ohaza-Fujikubo, Miyoshimachi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Hayakawa, Toru 4-8, Suehiro-cho 3-chome Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 06 /
Mino, Setsuko 7-2-8, Tsuruse-Nishi 2-chome Fujimi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 07 /
Yanai, Makoto, c/o Nisshin Flour Milling Co., Ltd Pharm. Research Center, 3-1, Tsurugaoka 5-chome Ohimachi, Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112397.4 | 24.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19900201453 | 31.07.1990 Original published format: JP 20145390 | JP19900292000 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29200090 | JP19900418549 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41854990 | JP19910084473 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8447391 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469449 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469449 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/00 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D451/02 (KR);
C07D513/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Diazabicyclononyl-Derivate als 5-HT3 Rezeptor Antagonisten | [1997/40] | English: | Diazabicyclononyl derivatives as 5-HT3 receptor antagonists | [1997/40] | French: | Dérivés de diazabicyclononyle comme antagonistes du récepteur 5-HT3 | [1997/40] |
Former [1992/06] | Azabicycloderivate | ||
Former [1992/06] | Azabicyclo derivatives | ||
Former [1992/06] | Azabicyclo-dérivés | Examination procedure | 29.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0096524 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0102195 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [XD]EP0377967 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [XP]GB2231265 (SANDOZ LTD [CH]); | [XP]GB2231264 (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) |