EP0524333 - Hollow body moulding process using a non-metallic soluble core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Siegfried Baumschulenweg 55 W-8630 Coburg / DE | [1993/04] | Application number, filing date | 91112439.4 | 24.07.1991 | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524333 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C33/00, B29C33/52, B29C33/12 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B29C33/126 (EP);
B29C33/0016 (EP);
B29C33/52 (EP);
B29C45/14836 (EP);
B29C45/4457 (EP);
B29C2045/14131 (EP);
B29L2031/749 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [1993/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gegossenen Hohlkörpers mittels eines Hohlformkerns aus nichtmetallischem Werkstoff | [1993/04] | English: | Hollow body moulding process using a non-metallic soluble core | [1993/04] | French: | Procédé de moulage d'un corps creux en utilisant un noyau soluble non-métallique | [1993/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/43] | 09.06.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1067316 ; | [A]JP1156025 ; | [A]JP56042950 ; | [X]US4743481 ; | [X]FR2631581 ; | [A]EP0313923 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 265 (M-839)(3613) 19. Juni 1989 & JP-A-1 067 316 ( TAIHO KOGYO K.K. ), & JP1067316 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 418 (M-871)(3766) 18. September 1989 & JP-A-1 156 025 ( CALSONIC CORP. ), & JP1156025 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 99 (E-63)(771) 26. Juni 1981 & JP-A-56 042 950 ( MIYAGAWA KASEI KOGYO K.K. ), & JP56042950 A 00000000 |