EP0475043 - Missile interface unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feld, Charles M. 8011 Oakdale Avenue Canoga Park, CA 91306 / US | 02 /
Griggs, Darrin C. 8726 Independence Avenue No. 111 Canoga Park, CA 91306 / US | 03 /
Humm, Larry A. 22923 Cantara Street West Hills, CA 91304 / US | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112538.3 | 25.07.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | US19900568300 | 16.08.1990 Original published format: US 568300 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0475043 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0475043 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/30 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
F41G7/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Flugkörperschnittstelleneinheit | [1992/12] | English: | Missile interface unit | [1992/12] | French: | Unité d'interface pour missile | [1992/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/47] | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2136097 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0201001 (GEN DYNAMICS CORP [US]); | [X]FR2597226 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) |