EP0525228 - Method for cutting workpieces using a chemical reaction and the mechanical energy of a fluid, for example oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORST K. LOTZ Feuerschutzbaustoffe Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lotz, Horst K. Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 W-6238 Hofheim-Wallau / DE | 02 /
Lotz, Mattias Kiefernweg 13 W-6200 Wiesbaden-Delkenheim / DE | 03 /
Lotz, Tobias Kiefernweg 13 W-6200 Wiesbaden-Delkenheim / DE | [1993/05] | Application number, filing date | 91112721.5 | 29.07.1991 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525228 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23K7/10 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B23K7/00 (EP);
B23K7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1993/12] |
Former [1993/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trennen von Werkstücken insbesondere auch aus Metall mittels chemischer Reaktion und physikalischer Energie eines flüssigen Arbeitsstoffes z. B. Sauerstoff | [1993/05] | English: | Method for cutting workpieces using a chemical reaction and the mechanical energy of a fluid, for example oxygen | [1993/05] | French: | Méthode de découpage de pièces, notamment métalliques au moyen d'une réaction chimique et de l'énergie mécanique d'un matériau fluide employé pour l'usinage, par exemple l'oxygène | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU | 04.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.09.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4449698 ; | [A]EP0354350 ; | [AD]US2521199 |