EP0472016 - Method for controlling a slip in a pellet press and apparatus for applying the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states BÜHLER AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzel, Willi Sonnenbühl 1 CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Révy von Belvárd, Peter BÜHLER AG Patentabteilung 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Révy von Belvárd, Peter BÜHLER AG, Patentabteilung CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 91112845.2 | 31.07.1991 | [1992/09] | Priority number, date | CH19900002697 | 20.08.1990 Original published format: CH 269790 | [1992/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0472016 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0472016 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472016 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/20 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
B30B11/201 (EP,US);
B30B11/005 (EP,US);
Y10S100/905 (EP,US);
Y10S425/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Schlupfregelung an einer Würfelpresse und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1992/09] | English: | Method for controlling a slip in a pellet press and apparatus for applying the method | [1992/09] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler le patinage dans une presse à granuler et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1992/09] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 07.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.08.1994 | DK | 31.08.1994 | ES | 31.08.1994 | FR | 31.08.1994 | GR | 31.08.1994 | IT | 31.08.1994 | SE | 30.11.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
ES | 31.08.1994 | ||
GR | 31.08.1994 | ||
IT | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
GR | 31.08.1994 | ||
IT | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
IT | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | BE | 31.08.1994 | |
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | BE | 31.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3932736 (ZAROW ALBERT I, et al); | [AD]FR2341429 (DESVIGNE MAURICE [FR]); | [X]US4238432 (HENDERSON JOHN A [GB], et al); | [X]US4463430 (VOLK JR JOSEPH A [US], et al); | [AD]EP0231764 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]); | [A]DE3816842 (SCHLUETER GMBH U CO KG H [DE]) |