EP0471240 - Hollow shaft made of fibre reinforced plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1993 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elastogran GmbH Postfach 1140 D-49440 Lemförde / DE | [1993/11] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states ELASTOGRAN KUNSTSTOFF-TECHNIK GMBH Landwehrweg W-2844 Lemförde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuermann, Helmut Burgunder Strasse 13 W-6701 Maxdorf / DE | 02 /
Kasper, Dietmar Kurzweil 8 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Karau, Wolfgang, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Karau, Wolfgang, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112848.6 | 31.07.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | DE19904025958 | 16.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025958 | [1992/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471240 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471240 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16C3/02 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
F16C3/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Hohlwelle aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff | [1992/08] | English: | Hollow shaft made of fibre reinforced plastic | [1992/08] | French: | Arbre creux en résine renforcée de fibres | [1992/08] | File destroyed: | 15.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2138921 ; | [Y]US4348247 ; | [A]DE3733731 |