EP0525243 - Method for the display of traced information in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schallier, Walter Heilighuisdreef 8 B-9810 Gent / BE | [1993/05] | Application number, filing date | 91112908.8 | 31.07.1991 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525243 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525243 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/24, H04Q3/545, G06F11/32 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
H04Q3/54591 (EP,US);
G06F11/323 (EP,US);
H04M3/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/13] |
Former [1993/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Visualisierung von protokollierten Informationen in einem Kommunikationssystem | [1993/05] | English: | Method for the display of traced information in a communication system | [1993/05] | French: | Méthode pour visualiser des informations retracées dans un système de communication | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1272287 ; | [A]EP0254115 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3921628 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE Bd. 3/3, 26. November 1984, ATLANTA(US) Seiten 1274 - 1276; D.C.NEWKIRK ET AL: 'A HARDWARE-INDEPENDENT TESTING ENVIRONMENT FOR 5ESS SWITCHING SYSTEM SOFTWARE' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 41 (E-879)(3984) 25. Januar 1990 & JP-A-1 272 287 ( KOKUSAI DENSHIN ) 31. Oktober 1989, & JP1272287 A 00000000 | [A] - TELCOM REPORT. Bd. 8, Nr. 3, Mai 1985, MUNCHEN DE Seiten 184 - 188; ERNST J. FEICHT: 'UBERPRUFUNG UND TEST DER SOFTWARE FUR DAS DIGITALVERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM EWSD' |