EP0471252 - N-alkyl-N-(meth)acryloyloxyalkylcarboxamides of aromatic carboxylic acids and of aromatic carboxylic anhydrides and adhesives containing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Michael, Dr. Richard-Zanders-Strasse 34 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Podszun, Wolfgang, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 55 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Finger, Werner, Prof. Dr. Zonser Strasse 78 W-4047 Dormagen 2 / DE | 04 /
Winkel, Jens, Dr. Letterhausstrasse 1 W-5000 Köln 71 / DE | [1992/08] | Application number, filing date | 91113021.9 | 02.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | DE19904025784 | 15.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025784 | DE19904039440 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039440 | [1992/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471252 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471252 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/69, C07D307/89, C07D307/92, A61K6/00 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
C07D307/89 (EP,US);
C07C233/69 (EP,US);
Y10S526/936 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/068 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | N-Alkyl-N-(meth)acryloyloxyalkylcarboxamide aromatischer Carbonsäuren und aromatischer Carbonsäureanhydride sowie Adhäsive enthaltend diese Verbindungen | [1992/08] | English: | N-alkyl-N-(meth)acryloyloxyalkylcarboxamides of aromatic carboxylic acids and of aromatic carboxylic anhydrides and adhesives containing these compounds | [1992/08] | French: | N-alkyl-N-(méth)acryloyloxyalkylcarboxamides d'acides carboxyliques aromatiques et d'anhydrides d'acides carboxyliques aromatiques ainsi qu'adhésifs contenant ces composés | [1992/08] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4148988 (MASUHARA EIICHI, et al); | [AD]DE3510962 (G C DENTAL IND CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0377072 (DEN MAT CORP [US]) |